No. 20-1374
Title:CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
John Doe, One, et al.
Docketed:March 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15074)
   Decision Date:December 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2021 to June 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2021.
Apr 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Care Management Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021Brief of respondents John Doe One, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 08 2021Reply of petitioners CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jul 14 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 3, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2021.
Jul 22 2021Motion to substitute Richard Roe, the Authorized Representative of the Estate of John Doe Two, deceased and suggestion of death filed by respondents.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gerald Sinclair Flanagan
    Counsel of Record
Consumer Watchdog
6330 San Vicente Blvd., Suite 250
Los Angeles, CA 90048

jerry@consumerwatchdog.org
3103920522
Party name: John Doe One, et al.
Other
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Independent Women's Law Center
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: America's Health Insurance Plans