No. 20-1373
Title:Wanza Cole, Petitioner
v.
Wake County Board of Education
Docketed:March 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1364)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Brief of respondent Wake County Board of Education in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW, Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
2026616582
Party name: Wanza Cole
Attorneys for Respondent
Colin Alexander Shive
    Counsel of Record
Tharrington Smith, LLP
150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1800
Raleigh, NC 27601

cshive@tharringtonsmith.com
919-821-4711
Party name: Wake County Board of Education
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center