No. 20-136
Title:Tremayne T. Dozier, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3447)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2020 to October 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 8, 2020.
Sep 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2020 to November 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 9, 2020.
Oct 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2020 to December 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 2, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Tremayne T. Dozier
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States