No. 20-1354
Title:City of Portland, Oregon, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Docketed:March 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-72689, 19-70490, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147 19-70326, 19-70339, 19-70341, 19-70344)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 22, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Communications Commission, et al.