No. 20-1349
Title:Rachel Threatt, Petitioner
v.
Ryan Thomas Farrell, et al.
Docketed:March 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-56371)
   Decision Date:September 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2021Waiver of right of respondents Ryan Thomas Farell, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2021Brief amici curiae of National Retail Federation and Restaurant Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2021Waiver of right of respondent Bank of America, N.A. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Attorney General of Arizona, et at., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021Waiver of right of respondent Estefania Osorio Sanchez to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 27 2021Waiver of right of respondent Amy Collins to respond filed.
Main Document
May 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 11 2021Response Requested. (Due June 10, 2021)
May 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021, for all respondents.
May 25 2021Letter of May 25, 2021 from counsel for respondent Amy Collins filed.
Main Document
Jun 10 2021Response to letter from Clerk of the Court on May 11, 2021 of Estefania Osorio Sanchez submitted.
Main Document
Jul 12 2021Brief of respondents Ryan Thomas Farell, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 12 2021Response to Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Bank of America, N.A. submitted.
Main Document
Jul 27 2021Reply of petitioner Rachel Threatt filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore Harold Frank
    Counsel of Record
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
1629 K Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

tfrank@gmail.com
7032033848
Party name: Rachel Threatt
Attorneys for Respondents
N. Albert Bacharach Jr.
    Counsel of Record
N. Albert Bacharach, Jr. P.A.
4128 NW 13th Street
Gainesville, FL 32609-1807

CourtDocuments@att.net
352.378.9859
Party name: Estefania Osorio Sanchez
Robert William Clore
    Counsel of Record
Bandas Law Firm, PC
500 North Shoreline Blvd, Suite 1020
Corpus Christi, TX 78401

rclore@bandaslawfirm.com
361-698-5200
Party name: Amy Collins
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Ryan Thomas Farell, et al.
Jonathan D. Hacker
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jhacker@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Bank of America, N.A.
Other
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: National Retail Federation and Restaurant Law Center
Jeremy Lynn Kidd
    Counsel of Record
Mercer University School of Law
1400 Coleman Ave
Macon, GA 31207

kidd_j@law.mercer.edu
(478) 301-2431
Party name: The Cato Institute
Kate Blakeley Sawyer
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

kate.sawyer@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: Attorney General of Arizona et al