No. 20-1334
Title:Bradley Boardman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jay Inslee, Governor of Washington, et al.
Docketed:March 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35113)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Bradley Boardman, a Washington Individual Provider, et al. submitted.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Bradley Boardman, a Washington Individual Provider, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: Jay R. Inslee, Governor of the State of Washington, et al. (except Campaign To Prevent Fraud and Protect Seniors)