No. 20-132
Title:The Moodsters Company, Petitioner
v.
The Walt Disney Company, et al.
Docketed:August 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55635)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2020Waiver of right of respondent The Walt Disney Company, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Suna Izgi, Orly Ravid, Robert C. Lind and Michael M. Epstein filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of California Society of Entertainment Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020Response Requested. (Due October 16, 2020)
Oct 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2020 to November 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 13, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Malin Arenz
    Counsel of Record
Robins Kaplan LLP
800 LaSalle Avenue
2800 LaSalle Plaza
Minneapolis, MN 55402

PArenz@RobinsKaplan.com
(612) 349-8500
Party name: The Moodsters Company
Attorneys for Respondents
Erin Joan Cox
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
350 S. Grand Avenue, 50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

erin.cox@mto.com
213-683-9575
Party name: The Walt Disney Company, et al.
Other
Michael Meredith Epstein
    Counsel of Record
Amicus Project at Southwestern Law School
3050 Wilshire Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90010

mepstein@swlaw.edu
310-403-5663
Party name: Suna Izgi, Orly Ravid, Robert C. Lind and Michael M. Epstein
Steven T. Lowe
    Counsel of Record
Lowe & Associates. P.C.
8383 Wilshire Boulevard
Suite 1038
Beverly Hills, CA 90211

steven@lowelaw.com
(310) 477-5811
Party name: California Society of Entertainment Lawyers