No. 20-1313
Title:Dimitri Shivkov, et al., Petitioners
v.
Artex Risk Solutions, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16746)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2021 to May 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2021, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David R. Deary
    Counsel of Record
Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon, LLP
12377 Merit Drive
Suite 900
Dallas, TX 75251

davidd@ldsrlaw.com
214-572-1700
Party name: Dimitri Shivkov, Individually and as a Trustee of the Phoenix 2010 Revocable Trust, et al.