No. 20-1306 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Alan Dale Walker, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:March 19, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2018-CA-01059-SCT)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2021 to May 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 19, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James William Craig
    Counsel of Record
The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
4400 S. Carrollton Ave.
New Orleans, LA 70119

jim.craig@macarthurjustice.org
504-620-2259
Party name: Alan Walker
Attorneys for Respondent
LaDonna Curtis Holland
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205

lholl@ago.state.ms.us
6013593827
Party name: Mississippi