No. 20-1293
Title:AbbVie Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Trade Commission
Docketed:March 18, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2621, 18-2748, 18-2758)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Unimed Pharmaceuticals LLC, and Besins Healthcare, Inc.