No. 20-1291 | |
Title: | WPEM, LLC, Petitioner v. SOTI Inc. |
Docketed: | March 17, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2020-1483) |
Decision Date: | December 9, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 27, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 16 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 27 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021. |
May 17 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
William Peterson Ramey III Counsel of Record | Ramey & Schwaller, LLP 5020 Montose Blvd. Suite 800 Houston, TX 77006 wramey@rameyfirm.com | 713-426-3923 |
Party name: WPEM, LLC |