No. 20-1287
Title:Recovery Innovations, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Kenneth Rawson
Docketed:March 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35520)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2021Waiver of right of respondent Kenneth Rawson to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 31 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 12 2021Response Requested. (Due May 12, 2021)
Apr 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 12, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lory R. Lybeck
    Counsel of Record
Lybeck Pedreira & Justus, PLLC
7900 SE 28th St. Ste. 500
Mercer Island, WA 98040

BEN@LPJUSTUS.COM
(206) 687-7805
Party name: Recovery Innovations, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Timothy K. Ford
    Counsel of Record
MacDonald Hoague & Bayless
705 Second Avenue #1500
Seattle, WA 98104

timf@mhb.com
206-622-1604
Party name: Kenneth Rawson