No. 20-1284
Title:Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rick C. Sasso
Docketed:March 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1583)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2021Waiver of right of respondent Rick C. Sasso, M.D. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 18 2021Letter to Justice Amy Coney Barrett of Rick C. Sasso, M.D. submitted.
Main Document
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 01 2021Response Requested. (Due May 3, 2021)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
George Thomas Patton Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Bose, McKinney & Evans
777 6th Street, N.W.
Suite 510
Washington, DC 20001

gpatton@boselaw.com
202470-1944
Party name: Rick C. Sasso, M.D.