No. 20-128
Title:Big Port Service DMCC, Petitioner
v.
China Shipping Container Lines Co. Ltd.
Docketed:August 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1111)
   Decision Date:March 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2020 to October 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 8, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Alan Herstoff
    Counsel of Record
Haug Partners LLP
745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10151

jherstoff@haugpartners.com
212-588-0800
Party name: Big Port Service DMCC
Attorneys for Respondent
Gina Maria Venezia
    Counsel of Record
Freehill Hogan & Mahar, LLP
80 Pine Street, 25th Floor
New York, NY 10005

venezia@freehill.com
2124251900
Party name: China Shipping Container Lines Co. Ltd.