No. 20-1279
Title:Angelica Castañon, et al., Appellants
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:March 15, 2021
Linked with 20A119
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Columbia
   Case Numbers:(18-2545)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2020Application (20A119) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from January 12, 2021 to March 12, 2021, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 04 2021Application (20A119) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 12, 2021.
Mar 12 2021Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due April 14, 2021)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2021, for all appellees.
Apr 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Office of General Counsel of the U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2021Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia Affairs Community of the District of Columbia Bar, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2021Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia Historians filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2021 to June 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 14, 2021, for all appellees.
Jun 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 14, 2021 to July 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 14, 2021.
Jul 01 2021Notice of withdrawal of appellant Susannah Weaver received.
Main Document
Jul 14 2021Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees United States, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2021Opposition to motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellants Angelica Castañon, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis LLP
1919 M Street NW, Fl. 8
Washington, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
202-730-1325
Party name: Angelica Castañon, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Other
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel of the U.S. House of Representatives
5140 O’Neill House Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: Office of General Counsel of the U.S. House of Representatives
Lorelie Sue Masters
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

lmasters@huntonak.com
2029551851
Party name: District of Columbia Affairs Community of the District of Columbia Bar, and Other Concerned District of Columbia Legal Organizations and Professionals
William R. Stein
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
1775 I Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

william.stein@hugheshubbard.com
202-721-4650
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: District of Columbia Historians