No. 20-126
Title:Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al.
Docketed:August 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1699, 19-1700)
   Decision Date:January 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2020 to October 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 8, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3599
Party name: Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mbienenstock@proskauer.com
(212) 969-4530
Party name: Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al.