No. 20-1246
Title:Anna Valentine, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Johnny Phillips
Docketed:March 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6184)
   Decision Date:September 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Waiver of right of respondent Johnny Phillips to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 29 2021Response Requested. (Due April 28, 2021)
Apr 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 28, 2021 to May 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 28, 2021.
Apr 26 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Anna Valentine filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2021Brief of respondent Johnny Phillips in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Courtney J. Hightower
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
1024 Capital Center Drive
Frankfort, KY 40601-8204

courtney.hightower@ky.gov
5026965513
Party name: Anna Valentine
Attorneys for Respondent
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 937-7294
Party name: Johnny Phillips