No. 20-1244
Title:Barbara Tully, et al., Petitioners
v.
Paul Okeson, et al.
Docketed:March 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2605)
   Decision Date:October 6, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2021Waiver of Paul Okeson, et al. of right to respond submitted.
Main Document
Apr 08 2021Amicus brief of Twenty-Sixth Amendment Scholars submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Barbara Tully, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Paul Okeson, et al.
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Twenty-Sixth Amendment Scholars
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center