No. 20-1233
Title:Johnny Gatewood, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-6297)
   Decision Date:October 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 7, 2021 to May 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2021.
Apr 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law at NYU School of Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Johnny Gatewood
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: Center on the Administration of Criminal Law at NYU School of Law
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation