No. 20-1229
Title:James W. Robertson, Sr., Petitioner
v.
Intratek Computer, Incorporated
Docketed:March 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50792)
   Decision Date:October 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 03 2021Response Requested. (Due June 2, 2021)
May 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 2, 2021 to July 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 2, 2021.
Jul 02 2021Brief of respondent Intratek Computer, Incorporated in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Reply of petitioner James W. Robertson, Sr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Joseph Wiley
    Counsel of Record
Rob Wiley, P.C.
2613 Thomas Avenue
Dallas, TX 75204

rwiley@robwiley.com
214-528-6500
Party name: James W. Robertson, Sr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jacob Charles Cohn
    Counsel of Record
Gordon & Rees
Three Logan Square
1717 Arch St., Ste 610
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jcohn@grsm.com
2157174004
Party name: Intratek Computer, Incorporated
Heidi J. GumiennyGordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
1900 West Loop South, Suite 1000
Houston, TX 77027

hgumienny@grsm.com
713-961-3366
Party name: Intratek Computer, Incorporated