No. 20-1212
Title:Peyman Pakdel, et ux., Petitioners
v.
City and County of San Francisco, California, et al.
Docketed:March 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17504)
   Decision Date:March 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 13, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Peyman Pakdel, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2021 to May 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2021.
Apr 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation; National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center; Texas Public Policy Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Brief of respondents City and County of San Francisco, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 14 2021Reply of petitioners Peyman Pakdel, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 01 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 08 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for proceedings consistent with the opinion of the Court. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jmccoy@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Peyman Pakdel, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kristen Ann Jensen
    Counsel of Record
Office of the San Francisco City Attorney
1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place, City Hall, Room 234
San Francisco, CA 94102-4682

kristen.jensen@sfcityatty.org
4153101103
Party name: City and County of San Francisco, et al.
Kristen A. JensenOffice of the City Attorney
1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Pl., Rm. 234
San Francisco, CA 94102-4682

kristen.jensen@sfgov.org
(415) 554-4615
Party name: City and County of San Francisco, et al.
Other
Sarah Elizabeth Roy Harbison
    Counsel of Record
Pelican Instititue for Public Policy
400 Poydras St., Suite 900
New Orleans, LA 70130

sarah@pelicaninstitute.org
5049528016
Party name: Pelican Institute for Public Policy
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation; National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center; Texas Public Policy Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute