No. 20-1211 | |
Title: | SynKloud Technologies, LLC, Petitioner v. Adobe, Inc. |
Docketed: | March 2, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2020-126) |
Decision Date: | July 28, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 30, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 26 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2021) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Mar 09 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Adobe, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 16 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021. |
Apr 05 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Timothy Devlin Counsel of Record | Devlin Law Firm LLC 1526 Gilpin Avenue Wilmington, DE 19806 tdevlin@devlinlawfirm.com | 302-449-9010 |
Party name: Synkloud Technologies, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jeffrey M. Fisher Counsel of Record | Farella Braun & Martel LLP 235 Montgomery Street 30th Floor San Francisco, CA 94104 jfisher@fbm.com | 415-954-4912 |
Party name: Adobe, Inc. |