No. 20-1210
Title:Seneca County, New York, Petitioner
v.
Cayuga Indian Nation of New York
Docketed:March 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-0032)
   Decision Date:October 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2021 to May 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Seneca County, New York
Attorneys for Respondent
David W. DeBruin
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

DDeBruin@jenner.com
202-639-6015
Party name: Cayuga Nation