No. 20-120
Title:Alfredo Juarez, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:August 4, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(17SC815)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:March 2, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Waiver of right of respondent Colorado to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 15 2020Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2020)
Sep 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2020 to December 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Philip Laurence Torrey
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program
6 Everett Street, Suite 3103
Cambridge, MA 02138

ptorrey@law.harvard.edu
6174950638
Party name: Alfredo Juarez
Attorneys for Respondent
L. Andrew Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
1300 Broadway St.
Denver, CO 80203

andrew.cooper@coag.gov
720-508-6465
Party name: Colorado