No. 20-1195
Title:Kansas Natural Resource Coalition, Petitioner
v.
Department of the Interior, et al.
Docketed:March 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3108)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 19, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Kansas Natural Resource Coalition
Blanket Consent
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2021 to April 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2021.
Mar 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc., and the Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd., Suite 610
Arlington, VA 22201-5330

jwood@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Kansas Natural Resource Coalition
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Interior, et al.
Other
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street, Ste. 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
(614) 224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc., and the Allied Educational Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute