No. 20-1180
Title:Territory of American Samoa, Petitioner
v.
National Marine Fisheries Service, et al.
Docketed:February 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17081)
   Decision Date:September 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2021 to April 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 28, 2021.
Apr 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 28, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 12, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Francis Williams
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland and Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20004

michael.williams@kirkland.com
202-879-5123
Party name: Territory of American Samoa
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: National Marine Fisheries Service, et al.