No. 20-1174
Title:Kim Lippard, et vir, Petitioners
v.
Larry Holleman, et al.
Docketed:February 25, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(18-873)
   Decision Date:May 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 23, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2021 to April 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 28, 2021.
Mar 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Law & Religion Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Julian H. Wright Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson
101 North Tryon Street
Suite 1900
Charlotte, NC 28246

jwright@robinsonbradshaw.com
7043778352
Party name: Kim Lippard, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Seth James Kraus
    Counsel of Record
Gibbs & Associates Law Firm, LLC
6398 Thornberry Court
Mason, OH 45040

Skraus@gibbs-lawfirm.com
5135713390
Party name: Larry Holleman, et al.
Other
Leslie Carol Griffin
    Counsel of Record
University of Nevada, Las Vegas William S. Boyd School of Law
4505 S. Maryland Parkway
Box 451003
Las Vegas, NV 89154-1003

leslie.griffin@unlv.edu
7133013105
Party name: Law & Religion Professors