No. 20-1143
Title:Denise A. Badgerow, Petitioner
v.
Greg Walters, et al.
Docketed:February 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-30766)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondents Greg Walters, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 02 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 7, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 05 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 14, 2021 granted.
Apr 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 16 2021Reply of petitioner Denise A. Badgerow filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Petition GRANTED.
May 28 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 22, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 10, 2021.
Jun 17 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Denise A. Badgerow.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 28 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jul 22 2021Brief of petitioner Denise A. Badgerow filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, November 2, 2021.
Sep 01 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 01 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and availble on Pacer.
Sep 10 2021Brief of respondents Greg Walters, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.(Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Arbitration Scholar Imre Stephen Szalai filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2021CIRCULATED
Oct 12 2021Reply of petitioner Denise A. Badgerow filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue, Ste. 700
Dallas, TX 75219

daniel.geyser@haynesboone.com
303-382-6219
Party name: Denise A. Badgerow
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Greg Walters, Thomas Meyer, and Ray Trosclair
Other
Thomas Glenn Saunders
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

thomas.saunders@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6536
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Imre Stephen Szalai
    Counsel of Record
Loyola University New Orleans College of Law
7214 St. Charles Avenue
Box 901
New Orleans, LA 70118

iszalai@loyno.edu
504-861-5589
Party name: Imre Stephen Szalai
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7220
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America