No. 20-1141
Title:Doe Company, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10187, 19-10261)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 2, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2021Motion (20M57) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Jan 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2021MOTION (20M57) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Motion (20M57) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2021 to April 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 26, 2021.
Apr 12 2021Motion of United States for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William M. Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

wjay@goodwinlaw.com
(202) 346-4000
Party name: Doe Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States