No. 20-1137
Title:California Parents for the Equalization of Educational Materials, Petitioner
v.
Tom Torlakson, et al.
Docketed:February 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15607)
   Decision Date:September 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Shree Shakti Mandir of Atlanta, 150 Hindu Temples and Organizations, and Teachers. (March 23, 2021
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2021Motion of Shree Shakti Mandir of Atlanta, et al. for leave to file amici brief not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted) (March 29, 2021)
Mar 19 2021Brief of respondents Tom Torlakson, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountOtherProof of Service
Apr 01 2021Reply of petitioner California Parents for the Equalization of Educational Materials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8270
Party name: California Parents for the Equalization of Educational Materials
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth Sydney Stein
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Education
1430 N Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

estein@cde.ca.gov
9163190860
Party name: Tom Torlakson, et al.
Other
Alan Michael Mygatt-Tauber
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Alan Mygatt-Tauber
10089 Ashley Circle NW
Silverdale, WA 98383

alan@amtappeals.com
202-236-9734
Party name: Shree Shakti Mandir of Atlanta, 150 Hindu Temples and Organizations, and Teachers