No. 20-1129
Title:Scott Phillip Flynn, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1263)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2021 to April 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 19, 2021.
Mar 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2021 to May 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 19, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ian M. Comisky
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
2000 Market Street
20th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

icomisky@foxrothschild.com
2152992000
Party name: Scott Phillip Flynn
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers