No. 20-1123
Title:Lenwood Hamilton, Petitioner
v.
Lester Speight, et al.
Docketed:February 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3495)
   Decision Date:September 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent Epic Games to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 26 2021Waiver of right of respondents Lester Speight; Microsoft, Inc.; Microsoft Studios; The Coalition to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 02 2021Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 17 2021Response Requested. (Due April 16, 2021)
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2021 to May 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2021, for all respondents. See Rule 30.1.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tillman J. Breckenridge
    Counsel of Record
Breckenridge PLLC
1325 G St, NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

tjb@breckenridgepllc.com
2025677733
Party name: Lenwood Hamilton
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth A. McNamara
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1251 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

lizmcnamara@dwt.com
212-603-3437
Party name: Lester Speight; Microsoft, Inc.; Microsoft Studios; The Coalition
Robert C. Van Arnam
    Counsel of Record
Williams Mullen
301 Fayetteville Street
Suite 1700
Raleigh, NC 27601

rvanarnam@williamsmullen.com
919-981-4055
Party name: Epic Games
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation