No. 20-1114
Title:American Hospital Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:February 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5048, 19-5198)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Brief amici curiae of 36 State and Regional Hospital Associations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2021.
Mar 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Yale New Haven Health System, BJC Health Care, UPMC and Vanderbilt University Medical Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Federation of American Hospitals filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 13, 2021.
Apr 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Rural Hospital Coalition in support of respondent filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2021Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, Sec. of H&HS in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 28 2021Reply of petitioners American Hospital Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED. In addition to the question presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether petitioners’ suit challenging HHS’s adjustments is precluded by 42 U. S. C. §1395l(t)(12).
Jul 09 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, American Hospital Association, et al.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: American Hospital Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Sec. of H&HS
Other
Thomas Richard Barker
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag, LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, CA 20006

tbarker@foleyhoag.com
202-223-1200
Party name: Federation of American Hospitals
Chad Ian Golder
    Counsel of Record
514 6th Street, NE
Washington, DC 20002

chadgolder@gmail.com
203-506-0670
Party name: 36 State and Regional Hospital Associations
Joe Robert Reeder
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig
2101 L Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20037

reederj@gtlaw.com
202-331-3125
Party name: Rural Hospital Coalition
William Barnett Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M Street, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

wschultz@zuckerman.com
202-778-1800
Party name: Yale New Haven Health System, BJC Health Care, UPMC and Vanderbilt University Medical Center