No. 20-1113
Title:American Hospital Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Docketed:February 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5352, 19-5353, 19-5354)
   Decision Date:July 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Brief amici curiae of 33 State and Regional Hospital Associations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2021.
Apr 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 13, 2021.
May 13 2021Brief amici curiae of Digestive Health Physicians Association et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2021Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 28 2021Reply of petitioners American Hospital Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: American Hospital Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Other
Chad Ian Golder
    Counsel of Record
514 6th Street, NE
Washington, DC 20002

chadgolder@gmail.com
203-506-0670
Party name: 33 State and Regional Hospital Associations
Howard R. Rubin
    Counsel of Record
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
2900 K Street, NW
Suit 200
Washington, DC 20007

howard.rubin@katten.com
202-625-3534
Party name: Digestive Health Physicians Association et al.