No. 20-1106
Title:Jane Doe, Petitioner
v.
Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc., et al.
Docketed:February 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1879)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris and Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa Street
Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

pstris@stris.com
2139956800
Party name: Jane Doe
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott P. Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Anderson & Kreiger LLP
50 Milk Street
21st Floor
Boston, MA 02109

slewis@andersonkreiger.com
617-621-6560
Party name: Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc., et al.