No. 20-11
Title:Richard Lawrence Alexis, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:July 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-60748)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2020)
Jul 07 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Aug 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 10, 2020 to September 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 9, 2020.
Aug 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2020 to October 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Aug 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 9, 2020.
Oct 14 2020Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

(202) 756-8000
Party name: Richard Lawrence Alexis
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen.