No. 20-1095
Title:Darius Wayne Haws, Petitioner
v.
Idaho
Docketed:February 10, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(47800)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021Waiver of right of respondent State of Idaho to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 01 2021Response Requested. (Due March 31, 2021)
Mar 30 2021Brief of respondent State of Idaho in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 14, 2021 to April 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 05 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 27, 2021 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: Darius Haws
Attorneys for Respondent
Kenneth K. Jorgensen
    Counsel of Record
Off of Attny Gen - State of ID
Statehouse Room 210
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

ken.jorgensen@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-2400
Party name: State of Idaho
Other
Jonah Joshua Horwitz
    Counsel of Record
702 W. ldaho St. Ste. 900
Boise, ID 83702

Jonah_Horwitz@fd.org
208 331 5530
Party name: Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers