No. 20-1093
Title:Just Energy Marketing Corp., et al., Petitioners
v.
Davina Hurt, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, et al.
Docketed:February 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4058)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Just Energy Marketing Corp., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Davina Hurt, et al.