No. 20-1092
Title:Brandon Jones, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-95)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2021.
Mar 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to May 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 14, 2021.
May 14 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2021Reply of petitioner Brandon Jones filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Brandon Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States