No. 20-109
Title:Scott Schwab, Secretary of State of Kansas, Petitioner
v.
Steven Wayne Fish, et al.
Docketed:August 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3133, 18-3134)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 2, 2020 to November 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2020.
Sep 02 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, and West Virginia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Honest Elections Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2020Brief of respondents Steven Fish, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2020Reply of petitioner Schwab, Scott filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brant M. Laue
    Counsel of Record
Kansas Attorney General's Office
120 SW 10th Ave., 2d Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

brant.laue@ag.ks.gov
785-368-8539
Party name: Schwab, Scott
Attorneys for Respondents
Dale E. Ho
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
Director, Voting Rights Project
New York, NY 10004

dale.ho@aclu.org
212-549-2693
Party name: Steven Fish, et al.
Other
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
222 S. Main Street
5th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

tyler@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Honest Elections Project
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: States of Texas, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, and West Virginia
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund