No. 20-1088
Title:David Carson, as Parent and Next Friend of O. C., et al., Petitioners
v.
A. Pender Makin
Docketed:February 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1746)
   Decision Date:October 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Carson, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 09 2021Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation and yes. every kid. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent A. Pender Makin to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition of Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Council of Islamic Schools in North America, Partnership for Inner-City Education, and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Innovative Schools filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of National Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of EdChoice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Liberty Justice Center,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 22 2021Response Requested. (Due April 21, 2021)
Mar 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2021 to May 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2021.
Apr 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 21 2021Brief of respondent A. Pender Makin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2021Reply of petitioners David Carson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners David Carson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Eugene Bindas
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
600 University Street
Suite 1730
Seattle, WA 98101

mbindas@ij.org
2069571300
Party name: David Carson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Ann Forster
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333

sarah.forster@maine.gov
2076268866
Party name: A. Pender Makin
Other
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: States of Arkansas, Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Jewish Coalition of Religious Liberty
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: National Legal Foundation, et al.
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation and yes. every kid.
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Leslie Davis Hiner
    Counsel of Record
EdChoice
111 Monument Circle, Suite 2650
lndianapolis, IN 46204

leslie@edchoice.org
317-681-0745
Party name: EdChoice
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 2100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: Innovative Schools
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Brief for Council of Islamic Schools in North America, Partnership for Inner-City Education, and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Russell Charles MenyhartTaft Stettinius & Hollister
0ne lndiana Square. Ste 3500
lndianapolis, IN 46204

rmenyhart@taftlaw.com
3177139423
Party name: EdChoice
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
208 South LaSalle Street
Suite 1690
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center