No. 20-1084 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
Matthew Reeves
Docketed:February 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-11779)
   Decision Date:November 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2021 to April 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2021.
Mar 11 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2021Brief of respondent Matthew Reeves in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
Apr 27 2021Reply of petitioner Commissioner, Alabama Dept. of Corrections filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2021Record Requested.
May 03 2021Record received from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit. The record is electronic.
May 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-353-2196
Party name: Commissioner, Alabama Dept. of Corrections
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert N. Hochman
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin, LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

rhochman@sidley.com
312-853-2936
Party name: Matthew Reeves
Other
Lacey Stover Gard
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
400 West Congress Street
Bldg. S-215
Tucson, AZ 85701

lacey.gard@azag.gov
5206286520
Party name: State of Arizona