No. 20-1072
Title:Chad Thompson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Richard Michael DeWine, Governor of Ohio, et al.
Docketed:February 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3526)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2021 to April 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 7, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark R. Brown
    Counsel of Record
303 East Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215-3200

mbrown@law.capital.edu
614-236-6590
Party name: Chad Thompson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Richard Michael DeWine, et al.