No. 20-1057
Title:Oracle America, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2326)
   Decision Date:September 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2021 to April 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 5, 2021.
Feb 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Frederick W. Claybrook, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2021 to May 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 3, 2021.
May 03 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 03 2021Waiver of right of respondent Amazon Web Services, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

allon.kedem@arnoldporter.com
2029426234
Party name: Oracle America, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Frederick W. Claybrook, Jr.