No. 20-1056
Title:Justin Wolfe, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:February 3, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(200205)
   Decision Date:September 3, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Waiver of right of respondent Commonwealth of Virginia to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 19 2021Response Requested. (Due April 19, 2021)
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2021 to May 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2021.
May 18 2021Brief of respondent Commonwealth of Virginia in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2021Reply of petitioner Justin Michael Wolfe filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: Justin Michael Wolfe
Attorneys for Respondent
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia