No. 20-1049
Title:City of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
Calvin McCraw, et al.
Docketed:February 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-6008)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Waiver of right of respondent Calvin McCraw, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Amanda B. Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
City of Oklahoma City, Office of the Municipal Counselor
200 N. Walker
Suite 400
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

amanda.carpenter@okc.gov
405-297-3846
Party name: City of Oklahoma City, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph T. Thai
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 961
Norman, OK 73070

thai@post.harvard.edu
405-204-9579
Party name: Calvin McCraw, et al.