No. 20-1046
Title:Marin Housing Authority, Petitioner
v.
Kerrie Reilly
Docketed:February 1, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S249593)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2021Waiver of right of respondent Kerrie Reilly to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Scott County Community Development Agency filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of California Association of Housing Authorities filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 12 2021Response Requested. (Due April 12, 2021)
Mar 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2021.
May 12 2021Brief of respondent Kerrie Reilly in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Reply of petitioner Marin Housing Authority filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Oct 05 2021Letter from Kerrie Reilly received.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
555 S. Flower Street
Suite 2900
Los Angeles, CA 90071

robert.cooper@wilsonelser.com
213-330-8950
Party name: Marin Housing Authority
Attorneys for Respondent
Nathaniel Peardon Garrett
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 California Street, 26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

ngarrett@jonesday.com
4158755731
Party name: Kerrie Reilly
Other
John Egan
    Counsel of Record
Rubin and Rudman LLP
50 Rowes Wharf
Boston, MA 02110

jegan@rubinrudman.com
(617) 330-7181
Party name: California Association of Housing Authorities
John Michael Reeves
    Counsel of Record
Reeves Law LLC
3703 Watson Rd.
St. Louis, MO 63109

reeves@reeveslawstl.com
3147756985
Party name: Scott County Community Development Agency