No. 20-1044
Title:Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, Petitioner
v.
Joyce Ramsey, et al.
Docketed:January 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1579, 19-1581, 19-1586, 19-1889, 19-1977, 19-3886)
   Decision Date:September 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
Jan 29 2021Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Feb 01 2021Motion of Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (February 02, 2021)
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Mar 25 2021Response Requested. (Due April 26, 2021)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Attorneys for Respondents
David Fallon Chermol
    Counsel of Record
Chermol & Fishman, LLC
11450 Bustleton Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19116

dave@ssihelp.us
2154647200
Party name: Joyce Ramsey, et al.