No. 20-1043
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Miguel Angel Cano
Docketed:January 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-50151)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 2, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2021 to March 31, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 31, 2021.
Mar 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 12, 2021.
May 12 2021Brief of respondent Miguel Angel Cano in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 12 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Miguel Angel Cano.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 01 2021Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 15 2021Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Harini P. Raghupathi
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender of San Diego Inc.
225 Broadway Suite 900
San Diego, CA 92101

harini_raghupathi@fd.org
619-234-8467
Party name: Miguel Angel Cano