No. 20-1034
Title:Narkis Aliza Golan, Petitioner
v.
Isacco Jacky Saada
Docketed:January 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1544)
   Decision Date:October 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 14, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief of respondent Isacco Saada in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Individuals and Organizations Advocating for Victims of Domestic Violence (Sanctuary for Families, Inc. et al.) filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Frederick K. Cox International Law Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 16 2021Reply of petitioner Narkis Golan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Karen R. King
    Counsel of Record
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
565 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10017

kking@maglaw.com
212-856-9600
Party name: Narkis Golan
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Min
    Counsel of Record
Burger Green & Min LLP
420 Lexington Avenue Suite 2834
New York, NY 10170

rmin@bgmlaw-nyc.com
2122571944
Party name: Isacco Saada
Other
David Alan Carney
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
127 Public Square
Suite 2000
Cleveland, OH 44114

dcarney@bakerlaw.com
216-861-7634
Party name: Frederick K. Cox International Law Center
Shailee Diwanji Sharma
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10018

ssharma@cov.com
2128411000
Party name: Individuals and Organizations Advocating for Victims of Domestic Violence (Sanctuary for Families, Inc. et al.)